Hey, Amanda Jane (CPSO#: 53080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: Wilkinson, Amanda Jane (used until: 05 Apr 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Outpatient Centre
865 Regent St S
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 2411
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Hey and Amanda Hey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hey ( CPSO# 53080 )
Dr. N. Hey ( CPSO# 50715 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital - Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4733

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Outpatient Centre
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 675-1596

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA JANE HEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1985