Heyes, Robert Harry (CPSO#: 26112)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. R. Heyes ( CPSO# 26112 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Robert Heyes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017