Higgins, David Anthony (CPSO#: 56020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33960
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1986