Higgins, Kevin McLoughlin (CPSO#: 71488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre,
Room M1 102 Head and Neck Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5104
Fax: (416) 480-5761
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Higgins ( CPSO# 71488 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MCLOUGHLIN HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2003