Hill, Laurie Leigh (CPSO#: 50720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone: (905) 455-3010
Fax: (905) 455-3011
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

34- 480 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-8800
Fax: (905) 790-6008
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

28- 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-3458
Fax: (905) 791-3460
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

203-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2265
Fax: (905) 595-2846
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

99 Sinclair Ave
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Canada
Phone: 9058779998
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laurie Hill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hill ( CPSO# 50720 )

Business Address:
203 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 495-2265

Business Address:
Unit 34
480 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-8800

Business Address:
Unit 28
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 791-3458

Business Address:
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 455-3010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE LEIGH HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jun 2006
Summary:

 On June 14, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Laurie Leigh Hill committed professional misconduct in that he had been found 
 guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise medicine.  The Discipline 
 Committee ordered that:

(a)	the Registrar shall suspend Dr. Hill's certificate of registration 
 for a period of four months commencing July 1, 2006, two months of which will be suspended if Dr. 
 Hill takes the College's ethics course or suitable equivalent course approved in advance by the 
 Registrar by December 31, 2006.

(b)	Dr. Hill be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
 recorded on the register;

(c)	the following terms, conditions or limitations will be placed on 
 Dr. Hill's certificate of registration:

(i)	Dr. Hill will retain a monitor acceptable to the 
 College who will review Dr. Hill's OHIP 	billings bimonthly for 12 months.  Dr. Hill will provide 
 the billing mentor with any 	documentation which he or she may request, and the billing monitor 
 will report his or her 	findings to the Registrar quarterly.  The cost of this review shall be 
 borne by Dr. Hill.

(ii)	Upon completion of the period of monitoring, reference to it will be 
 deleted from Dr. 	Hill's certificate of registration

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 14, 2006