Hill, Stephen Donald (CPSO#: 52677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Hill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hill ( CPSO# 52677 )

Business Address:
8 - 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN DONALD HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985