Himmel, Walter Morris (CPSO#: 29167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6002
Fax: (647) 346-9049
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 560-1187
Fax: (416) 630-9725
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER MORRIS HIMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIMMEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977