Hirji, Alim Shamash Bhanji (CPSO#: 86751)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alim Hirji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 36 Silbury Drive, Toronto, ON M1V 2P3
Date Received: 15 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 26 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015