Ho, Thi Cam Nhung (CPSO#: 63202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 398-0292
Fax: (416) 398-8389
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-8185
Fax: (416) 813-7909
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nhung TC Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ho ( CPSO# 63202 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 398-0292

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THI CAM NHUNG HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1990