Hobdari, Ilda (CPSO#: 87139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English, Italian, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 264-9859
Fax: (905) 264-9311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilda Hobdari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hobdari ( CPSO# 87139 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (904) 264-9859

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILDA HOBDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBDARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009