Hodgson, Therese Marie Marguerite (CPSO#: 57070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2530 St Joseph Boulevard
Unit 1
Orleans ON  K1C 1G1
Phone: (613) 830-5888
Fax: (613) 830-1791
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hodgson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hodgson ( CPSO# 57070 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
2530 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 830-5888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESE MARIE MARGUERITE HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988