Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hoffman, Thomas Matthew (CPSO#: 65722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 roseville gardens drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone: (519) 944-3393
Fax: (519) 944-3247
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2055 Huron Church Rd
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Canada
Phone: 519-255-9185
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

7875 riverside drive east
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 974-4122
Fax: (519) 974-0890
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2525 roseville garden drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 944-3393
Fax: (519) 944-3247
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hoffman ( CPSO# 65722 )

Business Address:
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6

Business Address:
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6

Business Address:
2525 Roseville Gardens Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 944-3393

Business Address:
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 974-4122

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS MATTHEW HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992