Holler, Theresa Anne Marie (CPSO#: 84323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 410
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 289-856-9933
Fax: 905-901-5550
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond Street
8 Cardinal Carter North, ENT Clinic
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5276
Fax: 416-864-5694
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Elm Wing 6183
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416 813-6558
Fax: 416 813-5036
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Holler ( CPSO# 84323 )
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 77457 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Medical Centre
4E15 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESA ANNE MARIE HOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011