Hollingworth, James Leslie (CPSO#: 28598)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jim Hollingworth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retreival Services 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel : 416-398-0638
Date Received: 22 Apr 2015


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. Website: www.GetMyMedRecord.ca Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
Instructions: Please submit an online request through the website or contact RSRS Support at the phone number provided.
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015