Holmes, Candice Nicole (CPSO#: 73702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Unit
61 Queen Street East
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7428
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roger Holmes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018


Corporation Name: Candice Holmes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Holmes ( CPSO# 73702 )

Business Address:
Family Practice Unit
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CANDICE NICOLE HOLMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001