Holt, David Jason (CPSO#: 90307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Center
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David J. Holt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pun ( CPSO# 87998 )
Dr. D. Holt ( CPSO# 90307 )

Business Address:
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 489-2106

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JASON HOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2012