Holtby, Joanne Lee (CPSO#: 62930)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Holtby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017