Honey, Liisa Lyn (CPSO#: 68239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 274-7282
Fax: (613) 274-2970
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Honey & Cochen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Honey ( CPSO# 68239 )
Dr. D. Cochen ( CPSO# 66709 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 274-7282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIISA LYN HONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2000