Honey, Richardson John D'Arcy (CPSO#: 32576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital Health Centre
61 Queen Street East
Suite 9103Q, 9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3705
Fax: (416) 867-7433
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. John D'A. Honey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Honey ( CPSO# 32576 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital Health Centre
61 Queen Street East
Suite 9103
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3705

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARDSON JOHN D'ARCY HONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981