Hood, Roberta Denise (CPSO#: 84930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Hood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hood ( CPSO# 84930 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ethiopia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 11, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roberta Denise Hood,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hood to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ROBERTA DENISE HOOD
                                          ("Dr. Hood")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hood, certificate of registration number 84930, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that the College received a public complaint
                  bearing File Number 105278 and investigated whether I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my practice as a family
                  physician practicing in emergency medicine (the "Investigation").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Hood, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hood, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping Course; 
                  
                        (ii)  Review and written summary of College Policy #4-12, Medical
                              Records; and
                  
                        (iii) Review and written summary, satisfactory to the College, of
                              relevant materials on the diagnosis and management of early
                              sepsis. The review will include a written summary of up to
                              2000 typed words with reference to current standards of
                              practice, how it is applicable to my situation, as well as
                              how I have made or plan to make changes to my practice. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that I participated in the University of
                        Toronto Medical Record Keeping Course on March 8, 2018 and
                        undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful
                        completion of the Professional Education, including proof of
                        registration and attendance and participant assessment reports,
                        within two (2) weeks of receiving it. I acknowledge that the
                        College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hood, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of the date I sign this Undertaking or, if no
                        satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hood, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of any person who or institution that may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received a public complaint and investigated 
                              whether Dr. Hood engaged in professional misconduct 
                              and/or is incompetent in her practice as a family physician 
                              practicing in emergency medicine. As a result:
                  
                              *     Dr. Hood will engage in professional education in 
                                    medical record keeping and the diagnosis and 
                                    management of early sepsis. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hood, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines the terms are satisfied. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Hood, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Hood, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Hood, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary ofthe Undertaking given by Dr. Roberta Denise Hood to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective April 11, 2018:

The College received a public complaint and investigated whether Dr. Hood engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her practice as a family physician practicing in emergency medicine. As a result:

Dr. Hood will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and the diagnosis and management of early sepsis.