Hooda, Aniket (CPSO#: 103413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4164945420
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4158 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T3
Canada
Phone: 6472672176
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aniket Hooda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hooda ( CPSO# 103413)

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 24 Nov 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIKET HOODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOODA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Apr 2017 to 02 May 2017
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017