Horvath, Anna Maria Blanca (CPSO#: 25720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Suite 3S 376
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6468
Fax: (416) 756-6024
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Horvath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horvath ( CPSO# 25720 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
3S 376
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA BLANCA HORVATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORVATH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973