Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hosek, Paul (CPSO#: 70584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519 749-4300 Ext. x2631
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hosek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hosek ( CPSO# 70584 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL HOSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001