Hosseini, Seyed Hossein (CPSO#: 86739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Dept Physicial Med and Rehab
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40815
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Hosseini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hosseini ( CPSO# 86739 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Physical Med and Rehab
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Suite B1-109
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED HOSSEIN HOSSEINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSEINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013