Hosseini, Tahereh (CPSO#: 101244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Jahrom University of Medical Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick ON  K4M1L6
Canada
Phone: 6136920244
Fax: 6136920258
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G1J0
Canada
Phone: 6132586133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tahereh Hosseini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hosseini ( CPSO# 101244)

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1A3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHEREH HOSSEINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSEINI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2016 to 18 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Apr 2016 to 16 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2016 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016