Hostetler, Jason Lee (CPSO#: 65583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone: (519) 472-1846
Fax: (519) 472-4453
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hostetler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hostetler ( CPSO# 65583 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 472-1846

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON LEE HOSTETLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSTETLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993