Hostland, Sara (CPSO#: 90966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Hostland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hostland ( CPSO# 90966 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA HOSTLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSTLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012