Houpt, Daniel Robin (CPSO#: 66633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Morton Community Health Centre
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 652-3318
Fax: (705) 6523945
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Houpt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Houpt ( CPSO# 66633 )

Business Address:
Morton Community Health Centre
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 651-0505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBIN HOUPT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOUPT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2002