Hourtovenko, Clyde David (CPSO#: 58556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 670-0654
Fax: (705) 670-9348
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clyde Hourtovenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hourtovenko ( CPSO# 58556 )

Business Address:
Unit 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 670-0654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLYDE DAVID HOURTOVENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOURTOVENKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1989