Howard, John Mitchell (CPSO#: 30476)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex Centre
Family Medicine Clinic
36 Heritage Drive, Box 160
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone: (519) 666-1610 Ext. 208
Fax: (519) 913-2899
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Riche ( CPSO# 30491 )
Dr. J. Howard ( CPSO# 30476 )

Business Address:
Middlesex Centre
Family Medicine Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Box 160
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Medical Records Location

Address: Electronic Medical Records Middlesex Centre Family Medical Clinic 36 Heritage Drive Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Nov 2017