Howes, Daniel William (CPSO#: 68380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 2507
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Howes ( CPSO# 68380 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL WILLIAM HOWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999