Hrdina, Josef (CPSO#: 77175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ophtalmic Consultant Centres Inc.
1880 Sismet Rd
Mississauga
Ontario
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

McLean Clinic
50 Burnhamthorpe Rd West, Suite 343
Mississauga
Ontario
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: (866) 731-0431
Fax: (866) 731-0431
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Visage Clinic
133 Hazelton Ave
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5R 0A6
Canada
Phone: 416-929-9800
Fax: 416-368-3113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josef Hrdina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hrdina ( CPSO# 77175 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6090

Business Address:
Ophtalmic Consultant Inc.
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Business Address:
McLean Clinic
Suite 343
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (866) 731-0431

Business Address:
101 - 133 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 0A6
Phone Number: (416) 929-9800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEF HRDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HRDINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008