Hsia, Cyrus Chen (CPSO#: 79995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Room E6-219
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 56060
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cyrus Hsia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hsia ( CPSO# 79995 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre, Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-219A
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYRUS CHEN HSIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008