Hu, Fang (CPSO#: 58996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Chungshan Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Simcoe Medical
239 Holland Street West
Bradford ON  L3Z 1H9
Phone: (905) 775-4863
Fax: (905) 775-8351
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hufang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hu ( CPSO# 58996 )

Business Address:
239 Holland Street West
Bradford ON  L3Z 1H9
Phone Number: (905) 775-4863

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FANG HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Nov 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1998