Huang, Louis (CPSO#: 68070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7454
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

305 Milner Ave, Suite 920
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1940 Eglinton Ave. East Suite 500
Scarborough ON  M1L 4R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-5222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9251 Yonge Street Suite 400
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

302 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON  M2N 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6986
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

236 Wellington St E Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G1J5
Canada
Phone: (905)713-9990
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-0262
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

330 York Regional Rd 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Huang ( CPSO# 68070 )

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Business Address:
500 - 1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Phone Number: (416) 752-5222

Business Address:
400 - 9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Phone Number: (905) 889-8006

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7454

Business Address:
Suite 200
236 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 713-9990

Business Address:
Suite 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
330 York Regional Road 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
302 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6986

Business Address:
20 Wynford Drive
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 441-2111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999