Huang, Max (CPSO#: 74751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 640-1755
Fax: (416) 646-0769
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

135 Queens Plate Drive, Suite 140
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-5770
Fax: (416) 231-5229
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Max Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huang ( CPSO# 74751 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
140 - 135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 231-5770

Business Address:
Suite 402
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 640-1755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAX HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004