Hubbard, Bradley James (CPSO#: 88510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 510-9962
Fax: (416) 510-9963
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradley J. Hubbard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hubbard ( CPSO# 88510 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 510-9962

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY JAMES HUBBARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBBARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013