Huber, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 84424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-8200
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
435 Reynolds St.
Oakville ON  L6J 3M5
Canada
Phone: 877-789-4247
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Canada
Phone: 613-738-2378
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Huber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huber ( CPSO# 84424 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-8200


Corporation Name: Huber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huber ( CPSO# 84424 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID HUBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011