Hudson, Jean Elizabeth (CPSO#: 59576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8144
Fax: (905) 820-1631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hudson ( CPSO# 59576 )

Business Address:
205 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-8144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN ELIZABETH HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990