Hughes, Philip Frederick David (CPSO#: 50804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Out Patient Oncology
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hughes ( CPSO# 50804 )

Business Address:
219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Phone Number: (905) 685-8082

Business Address:
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Outpatient Oncology
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 682-6451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP FREDERICK DAVID HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1986