Hughes, Rhiannon Mary (CPSO#: 56784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Names: Hughes-Benzie, Rhiannon Mary (used until: 20 Feb 2017 )     Hughes-Benzie, Rhiannon Mary (used until: 14 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Strowger Blvd
Unit 109
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone: (613) 342-1622
Fax: (613) 345-1620
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhiannon Mary Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hughes ( CPSO# 56784 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
Suite 438
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 342-8181

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHIANNON MARY HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2017