Hughes, Tracy Elynn (CPSO#: 70063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tracy Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hughes ( CPSO# 70063 )

Business Address:
Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc.
Hespeler Clinic
12B - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY ELYNN HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1998