Hui, Charles Pok Sum (CPSO#: 69901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Infectious Disease
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2651
Fax: (613) 738-4832
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rice ( CPSO# 74770 )
Dr. C. Hui ( CPSO# 69901 )

Business Address:
Division of Infectious Disease
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES POK SUM HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2000