Hui, Frederick (CPSO#: 31602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Bloor Street East
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Phone: (416) 920-4200
Fax: (416) 920-4204
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Bryne Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 9E9
Canada
Phone: 705 721 1969
Fax: 705721 1859
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

18 Wynford Dr.
North York ON  M3C 3S2
Canada
Phone: 416 4430811
Fax: 416 443 0482
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  June  12,  2014,  the  following  is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Frederick Hui, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hui to  the  College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Hui may not engage in the following treatments and/or procedures:
                  
                  (i)   IV colchicine treatment;
                  (ii)  hydrogen peroxide in dosages greater than .0375%;
                  (iii) epidurals;
                  (iv)  small scale scalpel surgery;
                  (v)   IV  antibiotics  unless oral antibiotics have been tried and  found
                        not to be successful;
                  (vi)  non-topical silver; and
                  
                  Dr. Hui shall not prescribe  a  different  conventional  medication for a
                  chronic   condition  that  is  being  treated  by  the  patient's  family
                  doctor/general  practitioner  for the chronic condition, unless and until
                  he has communicated this change  with the patient's family doctor/general
                  practitioner.