Humen, Dennis Paul (CPSO#: 29713)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Humen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 339 Windermere Road, London, ON N6A 5A5
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact the Division of Cardiology at London Health Sciences Centre at (519) 663-3671.
Date Received: 10 Apr 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016