Humphrey, Susan Marie (CPSO#: 60933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Riverside Hospital
6-27
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 81850
Fax: (613) 738-8228
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Humphrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Humphrey ( CPSO# 60933 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Room 6-27
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 19 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIE HUMPHREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1990