Hunkin, John Bradley (CPSO#: 28198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-9382
Fax: (705) 746-7758
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thompson Hunkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hunkin ( CPSO# 28198 )
Dr. M. Thompson ( CPSO# 28524 )

Business Address:
21 Belvedere Avenue
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2A2

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9321

Business Address:
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 1T4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9382

Business Address:
11 Church Street
Magnetawan ON  P0A 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 389-1951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 26, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Bradley Hunkin,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hunkin to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOHN BRADLEY HUNKIN
                                          ("Dr. Hunkin")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hunkin, certificate of registration number 28198, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice arising from a reassessment of my practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every:
                  
                              i.    Two (2) weeks for the first one and a half (1.5)
                                    months;
                  
                              ii.   Month, for the following three (3) months, upon
                                    receiving approval from the College to decrease the
                                    frequency of the meetings; and
                  
                              iii.  Quarter or fraction thereof, for the following seven
                                    and half (7.5) months, upon receiving approval from the
                                    College to further decrease the frequency of the
                                    meetings;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, five of (5) which will be for patients to whom one
                              of the substances listed in section (5)(b)(iv) is being
                              prescribed;
                  
                        (iv)  Review with me any cases in which I am considering issuing
                              new prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                              i.    Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              ii.   Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              iii.  Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27); 
                  
                              iv.   Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "C"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "D")
                  
                              v.    All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                    Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c.
                                    22 as noted in Schedule "E");
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least following each
                              meeting, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as identified in the report of the assessor dated May
                        8, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to ensure that Schedule "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  (g)   I, Dr. Hunkin, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Hunkin, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Schedule "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hunkin, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hunkin, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hunkin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Hunkin, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hunkin, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        College has received information regarding Dr. Hunkin's standard of
                        practice arising from a reassessment of his practice.  As a result:
                  
                        *     Dr. Hunkin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 12 months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Hunkin will engage in professional education in opioid
                              prescribing and medical record-keeping.
                  
                        *     Dr. Hunkin's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Hunkin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Hunkin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Hunkin, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Bradley Hunkin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 26, 2016:

College has received information regarding Dr. Hunkin's standard of practice arising from a reassessment of his practice. As a result:

- Dr. Hunkin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 12 months.

- Dr. Hunkin will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and medical record-keeping.

- Dr. Hunkin's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.