Hunter, Cameron Macgregor (CPSO#: 31692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Cherry Point
North Bay ON  P1A 4E4
Phone: (705) 476-1690
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

213 3rd Street
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

North Bay District Healthy Center
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2820
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

North Bay Vascular Lab
107 Shirreff Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-3150
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Hunter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hunter ( CPSO# 31692 )

Business Address:
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone Number: (705) 474-3150

Business Address:
215 3rd Street
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5611

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON MACGREGOR HUNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1980