Hurowitz, Eric Ephraim (CPSO#: 32470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 335-4669
Fax: (416) 335-4672
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric E. Hurowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Warren ( CPSO# 52133 )
Dr. E. Hurowitz ( CPSO# 32470 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 335-4669

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC EPHRAIM HUROWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUROWITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981