Hurst, Jody Lynn (CPSO#: 59540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 230
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 258-2230
Fax: (519) 258-5883
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lewis ( CPSO# 59558 )
Dr. J. Hurst ( CPSO# 59540 )

Business Address:
Jackson Park Health Centre
230 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 258-2230

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODY LYNN HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989